Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dina Asmussen | 06.12.2005 | 26.06.2006 | direktion |
Suzanne Flagstad | 28.10.2003 | 06.12.2005 | direktion |
Suzanne Flagstad | 22.06.2001 | 15.09.2003 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.02.2001 | 22.06.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Irgang Elsner | 03.07.2003 | 15.09.2003 | formand |
John René Frederiksen | 03.07.2003 | 04.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Helweg Claesson | 03.06.2003 | 15.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Trygve Lied Flagstad | 22.06.2001 | 15.09.2003 | bestyrelse |
Steen Lindkær-Jensen | 22.06.2001 | 27.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Steen Sindet-Pedersen | 22.06.2001 | 20.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.02.2001 | 22.06.2001 | bestyrelse |