Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Henrik Foltmar | 31.05.2007 | 19.01.2015 | adm. dir |
Klavs Bech | 30.06.2005 | 31.05.2007 | adm. dir |
Frank Viborg | 29.12.2000 | 30.06.2005 | direktion |
Klavs Bech | 29.12.2000 | 31.10.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klavs Bech | 14.12.2009 | 19.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Poul Henrik Foltmar | 31.05.2007 | 19.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Klavs Bech | 31.05.2007 | 19.06.2009 | formand |
Eva Lucille Fiedler Bech | 30.06.2005 | 19.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Frank Viborg | 31.10.2001 | 30.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Lars Erik Larsen | 29.12.2000 | 30.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Lars Linaa Jørgensen | 29.12.2000 | 30.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Søren Bech | 29.12.2000 | 30.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Povl Grønvald Fynbo | 29.12.2000 | 31.10.2001 | formand |
Klavs Bech | 29.12.2000 | 29.12.2000 | bestyrelse |