Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ture Nygaard Wibrand | 10.11.2006 | 12.12.2012 | direktion |
Michael Pedersen | 10.11.2006 | 12.12.2012 | direktion |
Trine Nygaard Wibrand | 13.08.2001 | 10.11.2006 | direktion |
Michael Birn Knop | 08.01.2001 | 13.08.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ture Nygaard Wibrand | 13.08.2001 | 10.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Michael Pedersen | 13.08.2001 | 10.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Rasmus Kloster | 13.08.2001 | 01.05.2003 | bestyrelse |