Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Anton Madsen | 07.02.2003 | 20.04.2004 | direktion |
Ole Nielsen | 27.11.2000 | 06.02.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Regnar Thomas Hansen | 06.02.2003 | 20.04.2004 | formand |
Per Dahl Hansen | 06.02.2002 | 20.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Anton Madsen | 27.11.2000 | 20.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Ole Nielsen | 27.11.2000 | 06.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Per Nielsen | 27.11.2000 | 06.02.2003 | formand |