Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
David Yadgar | 06.10.2005 | 15.08.2016 | direktion |
Fatima Yadgar | 15.01.2004 | 06.10.2005 | direktion |
David Yadgar | 01.11.2000 | 15.01.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
David Yadgar | 25.10.2001 | 06.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Fatima Yadgar | 01.11.2000 | 06.10.2005 | bestyrelse |