Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Martin Riisberg | 07.11.2003 | 19.05.2004 | adm. dir |
Jørgen Erik Due Jensen | 01.10.2003 | 07.11.2003 | adm. dir |
René Bergendorff | 15.09.2003 | 01.10.2003 | adm. dir |
Tommy Barfod | 10.11.2000 | 15.07.2003 | adm. dir |
Mette Såbye | 31.10.2000 | 10.11.2000 | adm. dir |
Ivan Longfors | 01.10.2000 | 31.10.2000 | direktion |