Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Robin Andrew Drinkall | 01.09.2000 | 26.09.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Robin Andrew Drinkall | 10.12.2001 | 26.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jan Schouenborg Dombernowsky | 10.12.2001 | 25.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
John Primdal Geertsen | 01.01.2001 | 10.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Niels Lysholm Engelhard | 05.10.2000 | 31.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ian Lewis | 01.09.2000 | 26.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Johan Ulf Bentsen | 01.09.2000 | 10.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ole Mikkelsen | 01.09.2000 | 28.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Edwin Joseph de Wit | 01.09.2000 | 01.09.2000 | bestyrelse |