Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Kristoffer Larsen | 04.03.2013 | 26.08.2013 | adm. dir |
Jens Kristoffer Larsen | 29.12.2010 | 04.03.2013 | direktion |
Anders Kristoffer Larsen | 31.08.2000 | 29.12.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Erik Skovgaard | 04.03.2013 | 26.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jens Dalsgaard Løgstrup | 04.03.2013 | 26.08.2013 | formand |
Jens Kristoffer Larsen | 31.08.2000 | 26.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Anders Kristoffer Larsen | 31.08.2000 | 04.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Ibrahim Bülent Alsan | 31.08.2000 | 04.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Erik Dalgaard Hansen | 31.08.2000 | 09.11.2012 | formand |
Carl Erik Skovgaard | 31.08.2000 | 03.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Kjær | 31.08.2000 | 03.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Søren Møldrup | 31.08.2000 | 21.12.2000 | bestyrelse |