Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lund Hansen | 15.08.2000 | 11.03.2015 | direktion |
Bjarne Lund Hansen | 15.08.2000 | 27.03.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gudrun Lilian Hansen | 09.02.2015 | 11.03.2015 | bestyrelse |
Lone Maria Hansen | 01.11.2010 | 09.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Muneeza Lovina Ethilia Hjorth | 27.03.2001 | 11.03.2015 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Lund Hansen | 27.03.2001 | 11.03.2015 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Lund Hansen | 27.03.2001 | 01.11.2010 | bestyrelse |