Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hubert Marinus Pedersen | 11.12.2001 | 09.02.2002 | direktion |
Michael Halle | 01.09.2000 | 11.12.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hubert Marinus Pedersen | 23.05.2001 | 09.02.2002 | formand |
Michael Halle | 23.05.2001 | 11.12.2001 | bestyrelse |
Karl Erik Capion Rasmussen | 23.05.2001 | 15.08.2001 | bestyrelse |