Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Christian Holm | 16.01.2015 | 01.07.2016 | adm. dir |
Bent Elvig Knudsen | 17.03.2005 | 16.01.2015 | direktion |
Peter Tang Nielsen | 06.02.2001 | 17.03.2005 | adm. dir |
Michael Christiani Havemann | 24.08.2000 | 06.02.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eskild Lai Mortensen | 16.01.2015 | 01.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Pedersen | 16.01.2015 | 01.07.2016 | formand |
Arne Christian Holm | 17.03.2005 | 01.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Peter Tang Nielsen | 17.03.2005 | 16.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Bent Elvig Knudsen | 17.03.2005 | 16.01.2015 | bestyrelse |