Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Balieu Betting | 13.07.2000 | 10.06.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dorthe Camilla Anette Rahbek Betting | 31.07.2000 | 10.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Christian Balieu Betting | 13.07.2000 | 10.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Etly Lici Balieu Jensen | 13.07.2000 | 10.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Martin Jensen | 13.07.2000 | 26.07.2000 | bestyrelse |