Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Johansen | 05.12.2011 | 10.04.2012 | direktion |
Jimmy O Brien Peylecke | 23.01.2009 | 05.12.2011 | direktion |
Karin Risager | 01.09.2004 | 23.01.2009 | adm. dir |
Kim Degnebolig Linding | 27.06.2000 | 01.09.2004 | direktion |
Kim Degnebolig Linding | 27.06.2000 | 15.06.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Linde Olsen | 05.12.2011 | 10.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jimmy O Brien Peylecke | 23.01.2009 | 05.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Niels Johansen | 27.06.2000 | 10.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kim Degnebolig Linding | 27.06.2000 | 10.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Niels Johansen | 27.06.2000 | 15.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Kim Degnebolig Linding | 27.06.2000 | 15.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jimmy O Brien Peylecke | 27.06.2000 | 15.06.2003 | formand |