Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Norbert Werner Happe | 16.12.2008 | 03.07.2012 | direktion |
Mike Happe | 22.03.2001 | 16.12.2008 | direktion |
Mike Happe | 22.03.2001 | 10.06.2003 | direktion |
Norbert Werner Happe | 28.06.2000 | 22.03.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Norbert Werner Happe | 28.06.2000 | 12.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Mike Happe | 28.06.2000 | 12.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Torben Fogh Møller | 28.06.2000 | 12.01.2012 | formand |
Norbert Werner Happe | 28.06.2000 | 10.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Mike Happe | 28.06.2000 | 10.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Torben Fogh Møller | 28.06.2000 | 10.06.2003 | formand |