Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gregers Christian Juel | 27.07.2000 | 20.03.2006 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 20.05.2000 | 27.07.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gregers Christian Juel | 27.07.2000 | 14.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Frants Dalgaard-Knudsen | 27.07.2000 | 14.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Erik Knud Juel | 27.07.2000 | 14.04.2003 | formand |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 20.05.2000 | 27.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 20.05.2000 | 27.07.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 20.05.2000 | 27.07.2000 | formand |