Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Erik Skov | 29.05.2000 | 14.05.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Reimer Larsen | 26.06.2003 | 16.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bent Emil Mortensen | 29.05.2000 | 13.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Lone Algaard Skov | 29.05.2000 | 13.11.2012 | formand |
Knud Erik Skov | 29.05.2000 | 14.05.2012 | bestyrelse |