Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Henrik Beukel | 09.11.2004 | 28.08.2018 | direktion |
Hans Henrik Beukel | 11.04.2000 | 22.09.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mariann Irene Lauridsen | 09.11.2004 | 09.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Per Dalgaard Hansen | 09.11.2004 | 09.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kim Christiansen | 09.11.2004 | 09.12.2004 | suppleant |
Pia Knudsen | 09.11.2004 | 09.12.2004 | suppleant |
Anders Anton Bojsen | 09.11.2004 | 09.12.2004 | formand |
Mariann Irene Lauridsen | 11.04.2000 | 22.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Nielsen | 11.04.2000 | 22.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Per Dalgaard Hansen | 11.04.2000 | 22.09.2004 | formand |