Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Thue Pedersen | 01.03.2001 | 28.02.2001 | direktion |
Jan Graversen | 27.04.2000 | 15.07.2003 | adm. dir |
Jakob Anker Hansen | 27.04.2000 | 11.10.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Thue Pedersen | 01.03.2001 | 15.07.2003 | formand |
Jan Graversen | 28.02.2001 | 15.07.2003 | bestyrelse |
Søren Ernst Duckert | 27.04.2000 | 14.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Christian Mailand Fossing | 27.04.2000 | 28.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Anker Hansen | 27.04.2000 | 28.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Skouby | 27.04.2000 | 28.02.2001 | formand |
Jan Graversen | 27.04.2000 | 11.10.2000 | bestyrelse |