Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Troels Edelmann Christensen | 23.05.2013 | 14.11.2013 | direktion |
Maria Cristina van Deurs | 17.04.2012 | 23.05.2013 | direktion |
Arne Linde Olsen | 23.09.2011 | 17.04.2012 | direktion |
Tim Carter Clausen | 18.05.2006 | 23.09.2011 | direktion |
Helle Edelmann Christensen | 02.12.2003 | 18.05.2006 | adm. dir |
Troels Edelmann Christensen | 01.05.2000 | 02.12.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mikhail Calamba | 17.10.2013 | 14.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Claus Rene Andersen | 23.05.2013 | 14.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Anja Leth Zimmer | 17.04.2012 | 01.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bendson Wittig | 28.03.2011 | 17.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Troels Edelmann Christensen | 02.12.2003 | 23.05.2013 | formand |
Helle Edelmann Christensen | 02.12.2003 | 28.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Kenn Ursbak | 06.10.2003 | 14.11.2013 | bestyrelse |