Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Schmidt Dalsgaard | 28.11.2000 | 31.03.2004 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 15.04.2000 | 28.11.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Hansen | 17.03.2003 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Hald-Christensen | 17.03.2003 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Leif Schmidt Dalsgaard | 28.11.2000 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Torkild Busk Pedersen | 28.11.2000 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Hans Aage Dysseholm | 28.11.2000 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Berit Fredberg | 28.11.2000 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Steen Schierbeck | 15.04.2000 | 28.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Britta Madsen | 15.04.2000 | 28.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Vera Lykkesborg Petersen | 15.04.2000 | 28.11.2000 | bestyrelse |