Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Irfan-Ul-Hassan Janjua | 17.08.2009 | 05.12.2013 | direktion |
Sumera Sheikh | 01.03.2006 | 17.08.2009 | direktion |
Arshad Zaman | 01.08.2005 | 28.02.2006 | direktion |
Naja Maria Nielsen | 18.05.2000 | 01.08.2005 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.2000 | 18.05.2000 | direktion |