Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Heinrich Iwer Brag | 05.04.2000 | 26.11.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Nortvig Mortensen | 26.09.2000 | 26.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ole Heinrich Iwer Brag | 26.09.2000 | 26.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Erwin Tilman Nielsen | 26.09.2000 | 26.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Lise Ejlskov Brag | 26.09.2000 | 26.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Jøker Eg | 26.09.2000 | 26.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Viggo Steffensen | 26.09.2000 | 26.11.2008 | formand |
Borris Tangaa Nielsen | 26.09.2000 | 26.02.2001 | bestyrelse |