Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Buhl | 17.02.2003 | 29.08.2003 | direktion |
Christian René Tang-Jespersen | 20.06.2001 | 17.02.2003 | direktion |
Jens Ole Legart | 23.05.2000 | 20.06.2001 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.04.2000 | 23.05.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Buhl | 17.02.2003 | 29.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Due Olsen | 20.06.2001 | 29.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Kildegaard Andersen | 20.06.2001 | 29.08.2003 | formand |
Christian René Tang-Jespersen | 10.11.2000 | 17.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Tofte | 23.05.2000 | 20.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Legart | 23.05.2000 | 20.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Kjærgaard | 23.05.2000 | 20.06.2001 | formand |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.04.2000 | 23.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 01.04.2000 | 23.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 01.04.2000 | 23.05.2000 | formand |