Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Christian Gernow | 01.08.2004 | 16.05.2006 | direktion |
Jens Lübeck Johansen | 14.04.2004 | 01.08.2004 | direktion |
Thomas Sinkjær | 21.02.2000 | 14.04.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Wagner | 15.03.2005 | 16.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Ralf Stuch | 15.03.2005 | 16.05.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hans Dietl | 15.03.2005 | 16.05.2006 | formand |
Michael Bo Pålsson | 17.12.2004 | 15.03.2005 | formand |
Flemming Pedersen | 20.08.2004 | 15.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Poul Ernst Rasmussen | 14.04.2004 | 15.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Steen Ernland | 14.04.2004 | 17.12.2004 | formand |
Søren Schifter | 27.07.2001 | 15.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Gudmund Tyge Korsgaard | 27.07.2001 | 15.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Pedersen | 27.07.2001 | 14.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jens Lübeck Johansen | 27.07.2001 | 14.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Sinkjær | 21.02.2000 | 15.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Nicolaas Johannes Martinus Rijkhoff | 21.02.2000 | 27.07.2001 | bestyrelse |