Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Halldor Pall Ragnarsson | 01.01.2003 | 07.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peter Søborg Kofoed | 13.11.2001 | 07.04.2008 | formand |
Hans Henrik Wissing | 05.11.1999 | 07.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lars Gredsted | 05.11.1999 | 07.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bent Ottesen | 05.11.1999 | 01.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Steen Groth Clausen | 05.11.1999 | 13.11.2001 | formand |