Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Daniel Arthur Karpantschof Reece | 22.08.2014 | 15.02.2022 | direktion |
Søren Meiling | 22.08.2014 | 22.08.2014 | direktion |
Daniel Arthur Karpantschof Reece | 31.08.2005 | 22.08.2014 | direktion |
Scott Campbell Macaw | 12.02.2002 | 31.08.2005 | direktion |
Edwin George Shelton | 12.02.2002 | 18.09.2002 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2000 | 28.03.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Wrede Scherfig | 06.03.2001 | 14.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Hoffmeyer | 06.03.2001 | 14.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Christian Richard Charles Dahlager | 28.03.2000 | 02.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Hoffmeyer | 28.03.2000 | 09.11.2000 | bestyrelse |