Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Larsen | 06.03.2003 | 15.08.2003 | direktion |
Jan-Allan Müller | 29.02.2000 | 06.03.2003 | direktion |
Aleksander Nordenskjold Vilhelm | 29.02.2000 | 29.01.2001 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 26.11.1999 | 29.02.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan-Allan Müller | 06.05.2003 | 17.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Peter S Kjærbæk | 15.03.2003 | 18.10.2003 | formand |
Helgi Larsen | 29.09.2001 | 01.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lars Larsen | 29.09.2001 | 15.08.2003 | bestyrelse |
Aleksander Nordenskjold Vilhelm | 29.01.2001 | 02.07.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jan-Allan Müller | 29.02.2000 | 05.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Arne Kartin Olsen | 29.02.2000 | 15.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Joen Jacob Toftum Hammer | 29.02.2000 | 16.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Aleksander Nordenskjold Vilhelm | 29.02.2000 | 29.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Andras Splidt | 29.02.2000 | 26.10.2000 | bestyrelse |