Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael René Nyberg | 05.12.2019 | 23.12.2020 | direktør |
Ursula Essemann | 26.08.2014 | 05.12.2019 | direktion |
Ursula Essemann | 16.11.2010 | 26.08.2014 | direktion |
Dorte Juhl Østergaard | 17.12.2002 | 16.11.2010 | adm. dir |
Lars Alexander Pedersen | 09.10.2001 | 17.12.2002 | direktion |
Astrid Rønnow | 28.01.2000 | 09.10.2001 | direktion |
Sven Flemming Koch | 27.10.1999 | 05.01.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joannes Maria Hessing | 30.10.2019 | 23.12.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Franciscus Maria Hessing | 29.05.2017 | 23.12.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Wouter Harlaar | 29.05.2017 | 23.12.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Ursula Essemann | 26.08.2014 | 30.10.2019 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Mikkel Hjelme | 26.08.2014 | 29.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Lars Richardt Petersen | 26.08.2014 | 26.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Ursula Essemann | 16.11.2010 | 26.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Lars Richardt Petersen | 16.11.2010 | 26.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Mikkel Hjelme | 16.11.2010 | 26.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Arne Juhl Østergaard | 20.05.2010 | 16.11.2010 | formand |
Lars Bundgaard Larsen | 10.12.2008 | 20.05.2010 | formand |
Jan Juhl Østergaard | 12.10.2005 | 16.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Alexa Elisabeth Hedwig Petersen | 17.12.2002 | 12.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Lars Alexander Pedersen | 31.10.2001 | 10.12.2008 | formand |
Dorte Juhl Østergaard | 09.10.2001 | 16.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Dvinge Pedersen | 09.10.2001 | 17.12.2002 | formand |
Jørn Rønnow | 28.01.2000 | 31.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Alexa Elisabeth Hedwig Petersen | 28.01.2000 | 09.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Astrid Rønnow | 28.01.2000 | 09.10.2001 | bestyrelse |