Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Preben Olsen | 24.06.1976 | 05.01.1996 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Nicolai Olsen | 24.06.1976 | 29.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Nicolai Fugmann | 24.06.1976 | 29.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Merri-Ann Fugmann | 24.06.1976 | 29.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Leif Preben Olsen | 24.06.1976 | 29.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Alice Sejersen Olsen | 24.06.1976 | 29.08.1990 | bestyrelse |