Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Worm Gotfredsen | 25.03.1983 | 15.05.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vibeke Rosenkilde Gotfredsen | 25.03.1983 | 15.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Worm Gotfredsen | 25.03.1983 | 15.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Thim | 25.03.1983 | 15.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Magnus Nesdam-Madsen | 25.03.1983 | 15.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans Juhl Simonsen | 25.03.1983 | 28.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
William Richard Sefton | 25.03.1983 | 31.03.1992 | bestyrelse |