Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Aksel Harrsen | 11.12.1975 | 02.10.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Aksel Harrsen | 11.12.1975 | 02.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Wiingaard Poulsen | 11.12.1975 | 02.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bente Wiingaard Cordsen | 11.12.1975 | 02.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Erling Seierup | 11.12.1975 | 27.06.1996 | personlig_suppleant |
Leif Brandt Andersen | 11.12.1975 | 17.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Erik Weber | 11.12.1975 | 17.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Nielsen | 11.12.1975 | 17.01.1989 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Petersen | 11.12.1975 | 02.09.1987 | bestyrelse |
Holger Poulsen | 11.12.1975 | 02.09.1987 | bestyrelse |