Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thorkild Haugaard Nissen | 11.06.1969 | 05.08.1992 | direktion |
Jørn Thorbjørn Christensen | 11.06.1969 | 02.04.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thorkild Haugaard Nissen | 11.06.1969 | 05.08.1992 | bestyrelse |
Allan Larsen | 11.06.1969 | 05.08.1992 | bestyrelse |
Mette Mikkelsen | 11.06.1969 | 05.08.1992 | formand |
Jørn Thorbjørn Christensen | 11.06.1969 | 02.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Niels Lykke Graugaard | 11.06.1969 | 02.04.1992 | formand |
Thorbjørn Christensen | 11.06.1969 | 22.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Sven Erik Christensen | 11.06.1969 | 22.03.1989 | formand |