Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ivan Bach Petersen | 01.08.1999 | 22.04.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ivan Bach Petersen | 09.03.2000 | 01.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Kousgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1999 | 01.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ingemann Brixhuus | 01.08.1999 | 01.10.2001 | formand |
Peter Lundgaard Nielsen | 01.08.1999 | 09.03.2000 | bestyrelse |