Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 15.03.1974 | 02.06.1994 | direktion |
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 15.03.1974 | 28.01.1994 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 15.03.1974 | 24.05.1993 | direktion |
Svend Tang | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | direktion |
Finn Biledgaard | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 15.03.1974 | 02.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Ganesh Nilakantan | 15.03.1974 | 02.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Bengt Hubertus Harboe-Schmidt | 15.03.1974 | 02.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 15.03.1974 | 28.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lone Christensen | 15.03.1974 | 28.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Stiedl | 15.03.1974 | 28.01.1994 | bestyrelse |
Tine Kyster Ørbekker | 15.03.1974 | 24.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Knud Ove Christensen | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Søren Tang | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Svend Tang | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Kim Biledgaard | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Finn Biledgaard | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Tine Biledgaard | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Else Tang | 15.03.1974 | 24.03.1993 | bestyrelse |