Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Oluf Wang Hansen | 01.10.2003 | 21.04.2004 | direktion |
Peter Carl Pedersen | 11.01.2002 | 21.04.2004 | direktion |
Else Pedersen | 11.01.2002 | 01.10.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Brunsborg | 19.03.2003 | 21.04.2004 | formand |
Steen Toft Lykke | 19.03.2003 | 21.04.2004 | næstformand |
Lene Merete Clausen | 05.03.2003 | 21.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Povlsen | 11.01.2002 | 21.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Inger Moeskjær Henriksen | 11.01.2002 | 21.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Else Mose Damgaard | 11.01.2002 | 21.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Ketty Margit Jørgensen | 11.01.2002 | 21.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Erik Juul Christensen | 31.03.1916 | 05.03.2003 | formand |
Orla Nielsen | 31.03.1916 | 11.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Helge Christensen | 31.03.1916 | 11.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peder Martinus Roesgård | 31.03.1916 | 11.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peder Lykke | 31.03.1916 | 11.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Herluf Madsen | 31.03.1916 | 11.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Carl Pedersen | 31.03.1916 | 11.01.2002 | bestyrelse |