Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Lars Fabricius-Bjerre | 04.12.1995 | 01.12.2002 | direktion |
Ole Hubert Strecker | 04.12.1995 | 01.12.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rie Berenth | 31.05.1999 | 01.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Angela Christina Alfsdotter Petré Strecker | 31.05.1999 | 01.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Ole Hubert Strecker | 04.12.1995 | 01.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bent Fabricius-Bjerre | 04.12.1995 | 31.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Poul Lars Fabricius-Bjerre | 04.12.1995 | 31.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Hubert John Strecker | 04.12.1995 | 31.05.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kent Ole Hougaard Nielsen | 04.12.1995 | 08.06.1998 | bestyrelse |