Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Casper Andrea Stoltze Rasmussen | 03.03.2000 | 02.03.2020 | direktion |
Lars Julø-Henriksen | 03.03.2000 | 23.04.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Casper Andrea Stoltze Rasmussen | 03.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Lars Julø-Henriksen | 03.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | formand |
Michael Stoltze Lumbye | 30.09.1988 | 14.02.2000 | bestyrelse |