Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anita Danielsen | 17.05.2018 | 12.03.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
John Christian Danielsen | 17.05.2018 | 12.03.2020 | formand |
John Christian Danielsen | 21.06.2012 | 16.05.2018 | bestyrelse |
Jan Lakdrup Gottlieb | 23.04.2009 | 17.05.2018 | formand |
Jannik Otto Hansen | 27.09.1996 | 21.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Brask Jensen | 27.09.1996 | 23.04.2009 | formand |