Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Christensen | 31.12.2007 | 25.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Jensen Holm | 21.05.2004 | 25.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Marianne Christiansen | 30.05.2003 | 25.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Knud Hallas Beer | 30.05.2003 | 31.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Nicolai Theodor Christiansen | 28.06.1993 | 21.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Tom Lindhardt Wils | 28.06.1993 | 30.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Anders Houmann | 28.06.1993 | 30.05.2003 | bestyrelse |