Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Orla Kristensen | 24.09.1999 | 14.06.2012 | direktion |
Peter Nielsen | 24.09.1999 | 23.03.2001 | direktion |
Svend Aage Brøndum Jensen | 24.09.1999 | 23.03.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ronnie Kenn Friischman | 23.03.2001 | 05.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Orla Kristensen | 23.03.2001 | 05.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Torben Høholt Jensen | 23.03.2001 | 05.03.2008 | formand |