Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mads Jensen Vagnby | 30.12.1999 | 11.09.2006 | adm. dir |
Kim Madsen | 15.09.1999 | 30.12.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Kirkedal Jensen | 31.12.2002 | 11.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Michael Lemvig | 31.12.2002 | 11.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Claus Christiansen | 14.09.2001 | 11.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Christian William Ahlefeldt-Laurvig | 14.09.2001 | 11.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hans-Otto Wildfang | 14.09.2001 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ole Andresen | 30.05.2001 | 11.09.2006 | formand |
Kjeld Søndergaard | 30.05.2001 | 31.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Steen Egsdal | 30.12.1999 | 11.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Mads Jensen Vagnby | 30.12.1999 | 11.09.2006 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Okkels | 30.12.1999 | 14.09.2001 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 15.09.1999 | 30.12.1999 | bestyrelse |