Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
René Hersland | 20.09.2000 | 14.11.2005 | direktion |
Tsukasa Jon Osanai | 20.09.2000 | 04.06.2004 | direktion |
Kaj Ove Thougaard | 24.08.1999 | 20.09.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kaj Ove Thougaard | 24.08.1999 | 20.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Per Visti Thougaard | 24.08.1999 | 20.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Kim Anders Thougaard | 24.08.1999 | 20.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Tsukasa Jon Osanai | 24.08.1999 | 20.09.2000 | bestyrelse |