Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Frederik Hansen | 28.08.2001 | 26.04.2004 | direktion |
Gianfranco Foiani | 28.08.2001 | 26.04.2004 | direktion |
Jesper Kilbæk | 31.08.2000 | 28.08.2001 | direktion |
Edoardo Musso | 09.12.1999 | 26.04.2004 | direktion |
Edwin George Shelton | 09.12.1999 | 28.08.2001 | direktion |
Clive Martin Baxter | 09.12.1999 | 21.08.2000 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.07.1999 | 09.12.1999 | direktion |