Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Raunkjær | 18.02.2014 | 23.07.2014 | direktion |
Leif Petersen | 14.08.2013 | 18.02.2014 | direktion |
Henrik Unno Norén | 28.06.1999 | 14.08.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Raunkjær | 18.02.2014 | 23.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Karin Jensen | 14.08.2013 | 23.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Nis Lorenzen | 14.08.2013 | 23.07.2014 | formand |
Leif Petersen | 14.08.2013 | 18.02.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Unno Norén | 28.06.1999 | 14.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kim Unno Norén | 28.06.1999 | 14.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jeanette Norén | 28.06.1999 | 14.08.2013 | formand |