Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Robert Jacobsen | 30.09.1999 | 20.11.2018 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.07.1999 | 30.09.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Simon Honore Jacobsen | 05.07.2011 | 24.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Mads Honore' Jacobsen | 27.05.2008 | 05.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Dorthe Jacobsen | 26.05.2005 | 24.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Karen Hellung Honore | 26.05.2005 | 27.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Erling Steen Christensen | 14.10.2003 | 26.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Robert Jacobsen | 18.10.2002 | 24.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Ladegaard Honore | 30.09.1999 | 26.05.2005 | formand |
Karen Hellung Honore | 30.09.1999 | 14.10.2003 | bestyrelse |
Dorthe Jacobsen | 30.09.1999 | 18.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.07.1999 | 30.09.1999 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 01.07.1999 | 30.09.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 01.07.1999 | 30.09.1999 | formand |