Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Hansen Holm | 26.07.1962 | 26.10.1988 | direktion |
Lars Kimer Mortensen | 26.07.1962 | 13.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Krossteig | 26.07.1962 | 26.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Hansen Holm | 26.07.1962 | 26.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nørkær Hansen | 26.07.1962 | 26.10.1988 | formand |
Knud Jørgensen | 26.07.1962 | 13.06.1988 | bestyrelse |
Lars Kimer Mortensen | 26.07.1962 | 13.06.1988 | bestyrelse |
Leif Klein Perkild | 26.07.1962 | 13.06.1988 | bestyrelse |
Preben Pihl Nygaard | 26.07.1962 | 13.06.1988 | formand |
Jens Michael Hvidtsted | 26.07.1962 | 16.11.1987 | bestyrelse |
Freddie Althoehn | 26.07.1962 | 01.07.1987 | bestyrelse |