Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Louise Lindberg Jensen | 08.09.2008 | 18.08.2014 | direktion |
Camilla Louise Lindberg Baretta | 08.09.2008 | 08.09.2008 | direktion |
Ole Lund-Thomsen | 01.08.2005 | 11.06.2008 | direktion |
Knud Sloth | 29.09.1975 | 01.08.2005 | direktion |
Mogens Lindberg Jensen | 29.09.1975 | 16.07.1991 | direktion |