Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Ladefoged Jensen | 29.02.2012 | 02.02.2017 | direktion |
Anders Krüger Petersen | 29.02.2012 | 02.02.2017 | direktion |
Jan Ladefoged Jensen | 25.06.1999 | 23.09.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Ladefoged Jensen | 23.09.2009 | 29.02.2012 | bestyrelse |
Anders Krüger Petersen | 23.09.2009 | 29.02.2012 | bestyrelse |