Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Thingstrup Holler | 10.06.1999 | 20.09.1999 | direktion |
Claus Ulrik Hasselbalch Busch | 10.06.1999 | 20.09.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Hvass | 21.10.2009 | 14.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Thingstrup Holler | 20.09.1999 | 21.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Claus Ulrik Hasselbalch Busch | 20.09.1999 | 21.10.2009 | bestyrelse |