Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Peter Bech | 01.09.2001 | 11.12.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Skov Petersen | 16.06.2001 | 11.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jan Robert Christoffersen | 13.06.2001 | 11.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jeppe Frandsen | 13.06.2001 | 11.12.2003 | formand |
Mikael Bak | 06.04.2001 | 15.06.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jens Kristian Kjær Krogsgaard | 11.12.2000 | 11.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lars Rønn | 11.12.2000 | 11.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Ove Kornerup | 23.04.2000 | 10.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Søren Landgreen Sørensen | 23.04.2000 | 08.09.2000 | bestyrelse |
Morten Hanehøj | 07.06.1999 | 06.04.2001 | bestyrelse |